THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10
27 Ruth Ave.
Brampton ON L6Z 4R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 495-5888
Fax: (905) 495-5822
Address: 312 Queen St. E.
Brampton Ontario L6V1C2
Phone: 905 568 7377
Fax: 905 568 7477
Address: 1605 Main St. West
Hamilton ON L8S 1E6
Phone: 905 527 2991
Fax: 905 529 1222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aimal Sediq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sediq (CPSO#: 76542 )
Business Address: 1605 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1E6
(905) 574-4911
Business Address: Unit 10
27 Ruth Avenue
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4R2
(905) 495-5888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10
27 Ruth Ave.
Brampton ON L6Z 4R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 495-5888
Fax: (905) 495-5822
Address: 312 Queen St. E.
Brampton Ontario L6V1C2
Phone: 905 568 7377
Fax: 905 568 7477
Address: 1605 Main St. West
Hamilton ON L8S 1E6
Phone: 905 527 2991
Fax: 905 529 1222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aimal Sediq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sediq (CPSO#: 76542 )
Business Address: 1605 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1E6
(905) 574-4911
Business Address: Unit 10
27 Ruth Avenue
Brampton Ontario L6Z 4R2
(905) 495-5888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIMAL SEDIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDIQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIMAL SEDIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDIQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001