THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:57:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lho (CPSO#: 76553 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6882

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lho (CPSO#: 76553 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6882

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HYOUNG-ZIN LHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LHO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HYOUNG-ZIN LHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LHO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001