THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:28:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6186
Fax: (416) 756-6095
Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 633-9420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Enoch K.Y. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lai (CPSO#: 76585 )
Business Address: Department of Medical Imaging
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6186

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6186
Fax: (416) 756-6095
Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 633-9420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Enoch K.Y. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lai (CPSO#: 76585 )
Business Address: Department of Medical Imaging
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6186

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENOCH KAM YIU LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENOCH KAM YIU LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2001