THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:59:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4315
Fax: 613-907-8027
Address: 270 Av Marier
Vanier ON K1L 5P8
Phone: 613-744-2892
Extension: 1432
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Boushey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nault (CPSO#: 76594 ) Dr. E. Boushey (CPSO#: 75989 )
Business Address: Hopital Montford
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4315
Fax: 613-907-8027
Address: 270 Av Marier
Vanier ON K1L 5P8
Phone: 613-744-2892
Extension: 1432
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Boushey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nault (CPSO#: 76594 ) Dr. E. Boushey (CPSO#: 75989 )
Business Address: Hopital Montford
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE RACHEL NAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE RACHEL NAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 23 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001