THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:37:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 309
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 337-1663
Fax: (289) 337-4407

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baillie (CPSO#: 76602 )
Business Address: Suite 309
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(289) 337-1663

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 309
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 337-1663
Fax: (289) 337-4407

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Baillie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baillie (CPSO#: 76602 )
Business Address: Suite 309
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(289) 337-1663

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE IRMGARD BAILLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILLIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE IRMGARD BAILLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILLIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001