THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:17:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8132
Fax: (519) 685-8357

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Wyllie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wyllie (CPSO#: 76606 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8132

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8132
Fax: (519) 685-8357

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Wyllie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wyllie (CPSO#: 76606 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8132

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAIR FREDERICK WYLLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYLLIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BLAIR FREDERICK WYLLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYLLIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001