THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:01:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 4501
Fax: (613) 546-8209

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Michael Booth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Booth (CPSO#: 76617 )
Business Address: 25 King St W 613 544-2631 ext 4501

Corporation Name: Christopher Michael Booth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 4501
Fax: (613) 546-8209

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Michael Booth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Booth (CPSO#: 76617 )
Business Address: 25 King St W 613 544-2631 ext 4501

Corporation Name: Christopher Michael Booth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL BOOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL BOOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001