THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:40:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 138
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 971-2726
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Walk In
Suite 103
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-5696
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sailaja Choppa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Choppa (CPSO#: 76635 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU
Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 138
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 971-2726
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Walk In
Suite 103
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-5696
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sailaja Choppa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Choppa (CPSO#: 76635 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAILAJA CHOPPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPPA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAILAJA CHOPPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPPA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2001