THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Al-Arab Medical University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lorraine Wing
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-3675
Extension: 6702
Fax: (613) 732-6347

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El Fitori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. El Fitori (CPSO#: 76640 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Al-Arab Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lorraine Wing
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 2J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 732-3675
Extension: 6702
Fax: (613) 732-6347

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El Fitori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. El Fitori (CPSO#: 76640 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL K EL FITORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL FITORI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL K EL FITORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL FITORI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Al-Arab Medical University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001