THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:05:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: B. J. Medical College, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4N-474, 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 17 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Davierwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Davierwala (CPSO#: 76694 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
4N-474
Toronto ON M5G 2C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: B. J. Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4N-474, 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 17 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Davierwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Davierwala (CPSO#: 76694 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth St
4N-474
Toronto ON M5G 2C4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 May 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 17 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PIROZE MINOO DAVIERWALA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Cardiac Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DAVIERWALA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. DAVIERWALA no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PIROZE MINOO DAVIERWALA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Cardiac Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DAVIERWALA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. DAVIERWALA no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: B. J. Medical College, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001