THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:09:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2006 Robertson Road, Unit #11
Ottawa Ontario K2H 1A5
Phone: 613-903-6006
Fax: 613-421-3997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 14 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gopalan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gopalan (CPSO#: 76710 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2604

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2006 Robertson Road, Unit #11
Ottawa Ontario K2H 1A5
Phone: 613-903-6006
Fax: 613-421-3997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 14 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gopalan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gopalan (CPSO#: 76710 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2604

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BHASKAR SANTHANA GOPALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPALAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BHASKAR SANTHANA GOPALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPALAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001