THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tabriz University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2025 Midland Ave
Toronto ON M1P 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 647-490-6330
Address: Dundas 427 Medical Clinic
4A 2200 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Phone: (905) 232-0720
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1A-1595 Merivale Rd
Nepean ON K2G 3J4
Phone: 613 2242800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Warden Woods Medical centre
99 Firvalley Crt
Scarborough Ontario M1L 1P2
Phone: 416 699 5559
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Greystone Medical Centre
8 Greystone Walk Dr
Scarborough Ontario M1K 5J2
Phone: (416) 266-5888
Fax: (647) 341-8880
Address: Markham Kingston's Road Medical
3545 Kingston Road
Scarborough Ontario M1M 1R6
Phone: 416 2666600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1261 Kennedy Rd
Unit 3
Scarborough ON M1P 2L4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ellesmere family health group
2100 Ellesmere rd Suit 106
Toronto Ontario M1H 3B7
Phone: 416 6903533
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Phone: 416-597-1016
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Toronto Ontario M1K 1H8
Phone: (416) 264-4848
Extension: 111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
900 Albion Road
Toronto Ontario M9V 1A5
Phone: 647 7222370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 390 Steeles Appletree Ltd
1450 Oconnor Drive
Building 1
Suite 20
Toronto Ontario M4B 2T8
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Main Healthcare
3400 Danforth ave
Suit 6
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E1
Phone: (416) 693-3030
Fax: 416 693 3033
Address: Kingston-Morningside Medical Clinic
Suite 204
4500 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 2N9
Phone: (416) 287-3100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Choice Walk-In Clinic
815 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C9
Phone: (416) 533-1145
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Khodabandehloo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khodabandehloo (CPSO#: 76723 )
Business Address: Suite 204
4500 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 2N9
Business Address: 815 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C9
Business Address: 880 Danforth Road
Toronto Ontario M1K 1H8
(416) 264-4848 Extn: 111
Business Address: Suite 100
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: 2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8T5
(613) 482-0118

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Tabriz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2025 Midland Ave
Toronto ON M1P 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 647-490-6330
Address: Dundas 427 Medical Clinic
4A 2200 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Phone: (905) 232-0720
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1A-1595 Merivale Rd
Nepean ON K2G 3J4
Phone: 613 2242800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Warden Woods Medical centre
99 Firvalley Crt
Scarborough Ontario M1L 1P2
Phone: 416 699 5559
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Greystone Medical Centre
8 Greystone Walk Dr
Scarborough Ontario M1K 5J2
Phone: (416) 266-5888
Fax: (647) 341-8880
Address: Markham Kingston's Road Medical
3545 Kingston Road
Scarborough Ontario M1M 1R6
Phone: 416 2666600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1261 Kennedy Rd
Unit 3
Scarborough ON M1P 2L4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ellesmere family health group
2100 Ellesmere rd Suit 106
Toronto Ontario M1H 3B7
Phone: 416 6903533
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Phone: 416-597-1016
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Toronto Ontario M1K 1H8
Phone: (416) 264-4848
Extension: 111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
900 Albion Road
Toronto Ontario M9V 1A5
Phone: 647 7222370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 390 Steeles Appletree Ltd
1450 Oconnor Drive
Building 1
Suite 20
Toronto Ontario M4B 2T8
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Main Healthcare
3400 Danforth ave
Suit 6
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E1
Phone: (416) 693-3030
Fax: 416 693 3033
Address: Kingston-Morningside Medical Clinic
Suite 204
4500 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 2N9
Phone: (416) 287-3100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Choice Walk-In Clinic
815 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C9
Phone: (416) 533-1145
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Khodabandehloo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khodabandehloo (CPSO#: 76723 )
Business Address: Suite 204
4500 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 2N9
Business Address: 815 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C9
Business Address: 880 Danforth Road
Toronto Ontario M1K 1H8
(416) 264-4848 Extn: 111
Business Address: Suite 100
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: 2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8T5
(613) 482-0118

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
01 May 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 01 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from August 18, 2014, the following term, condition and limitation is
imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohammed Khodabandahloo,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Khodabandahloo has given to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Effective August 18, 2014, Dr. Khodabandahloo has ceased to practice:

1. Arthroscopy

2. Arthroplasty

3. Preoperative or postoperative patient assessments; and

4. Any other surgical practice save and except for minor surgical
procedures under local anaesthetic involving the skin and
subcutaneous tissues, including such assessments and consultations
as are associated with these minor procedures.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from August 18, 2014, the following term, condition and limitation is
imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohammed Khodabandahloo,
in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Khodabandahloo has given to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Effective August 18, 2014, Dr. Khodabandahloo has ceased to practice:

1. Arthroscopy

2. Arthroplasty

3. Preoperative or postoperative patient assessments; and

4. Any other surgical practice save and except for minor surgical
procedures under local anaesthetic involving the skin and
subcutaneous tissues, including such assessments and consultations
as are associated with these minor procedures.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2015
Summary:
Dr. Khodabandehloo has completed all the requirements for his SCERP.
 
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2015
Summary:
Dr. Khodabandehloo has completed all the requirements for his SCERP.
 
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP.

Training

Medical School: Tabriz University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 May 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 13 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 18 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001