THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BENGALI, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404-191 McNaughton Road East
Heart and Vascular Centre for Excellence
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2892175530
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON L6A 4E2
Phone: 289217-5530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sudip Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Datta (CPSO#: 76753 )
Business Address: 11 Charlton Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6W4
(416) 648-9258

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, BENGALI, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404-191 McNaughton Road East
Heart and Vascular Centre for Excellence
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2892175530
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON L6A 4E2
Phone: 289217-5530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sudip Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Datta (CPSO#: 76753 )
Business Address: 11 Charlton Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L4J 6W4
(416) 648-9258

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDIP DATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDIP DATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001