THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:04:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ashe, Stephanie Kate (Used Until: 15 Aug 2010) Finn, Stephanie Kate (Used Until: 08 Apr 2002)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 408-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898353426
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Finn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Finn (CPSO#: 76762 )
Business Address: 408-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
2898353426

General Information

Former Name: Ashe, Stephanie Kate (Used Until: 15 Aug 2010) Finn, Stephanie Kate (Used Until: 08 Apr 2002)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 408-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898353426
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Finn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Finn (CPSO#: 76762 )
Business Address: 408-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
2898353426

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE KATE FINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE KATE FINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2001