THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:49:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julien Marti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marti (CPSO#: 76823 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 675-4733

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julien Marti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marti (CPSO#: 76823 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 675-4733

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIEN ANTOINE MARTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIEN ANTOINE MARTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2001