THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 18:52:38 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Providence Care Hospital
Postal Bag 603
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Extension: 51196
Fax: (613) 540-6114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milev and Mileva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mileva (CPSO#: 76839 ) Dr. R. Milev (CPSO#: 76840 )
Business Address: 201 - 791 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1E9
(613) 544-2727

Corporation Name: Dr. Roumen Milev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

Corporation Name: Yuhuan Xie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jan 2017

Corporation Name: Adil Al-Mousawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Sep 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN
Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Providence Care Hospital
Postal Bag 603
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Extension: 51196
Fax: (613) 540-6114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milev and Mileva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mileva (CPSO#: 76839 ) Dr. R. Milev (CPSO#: 76840 )
Business Address: 201 - 791 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1E9
(613) 544-2727

Corporation Name: Dr. Roumen Milev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

Corporation Name: Yuhuan Xie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jan 2017

Corporation Name: Adil Al-Mousawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Sep 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROUMEN VASSILEV MILEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILEV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROUMEN VASSILEV MILEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILEV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical Academy Sofia, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2001