THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:22:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-2222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cornwall Health Care Centre
Suite 128
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 936-1564
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne Scharf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Scharf (CPSO#: 76851 )
Business Address: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 Country Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-2222
Business Address: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240
Business Address: Cornwall Health Care Centre
Suite 128
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 936-8717

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-2222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cornwall Health Care Centre
Suite 128
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 936-1564
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 26 Oct 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne Scharf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Scharf (CPSO#: 76851 )
Business Address: Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 Country Road 43
Alexandria Ontario K0C 1A0
(613) 525-2222
Business Address: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240
Business Address: Cornwall Health Care Centre
Suite 128
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 936-8717

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE HANDEL SCHARF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHARF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE HANDEL SCHARF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHARF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2001