THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:09:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 204
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 553-5400
Fax: (905) 553-5477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shimanovsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shimanovsky (CPSO#: 76868 )
Business Address: Suite 204
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 553-5400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 204
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 553-5400
Fax: (905) 553-5477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shimanovsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shimanovsky (CPSO#: 76868 )
Business Address: Suite 204
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 553-5400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUDMILA ALEXEYEVNA SHIMANOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIMANOVSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUDMILA ALEXEYEVNA SHIMANOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIMANOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Aug 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2001