THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:42:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovaird Dr East, Suite 613
Brampton ON L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057991398
Fax: 9057999099
Address: Department of Pediatrics
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajeev Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta (CPSO#: 76886 )
Business Address: 2250 Bovaird Dr East
Suite 613
Toronto ON L6R0W3
9057991399
Business Address: Suite 208
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 799-1399
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2250 Bovaird Dr East, Suite 613
Brampton ON L6R 0W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057991398
Fax: 9057999099
Address: Department of Pediatrics
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajeev Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta (CPSO#: 76886 )
Business Address: 2250 Bovaird Dr East
Suite 613
Toronto ON L6R0W3
9057991399
Business Address: Suite 208
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 799-1399
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJEEV GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJEEV GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2001