THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:24:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 233
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 415-0800
Fax: (905) 415-0801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Terry C.C Poon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Poon (CPSO#: 76895 )
Business Address: Suite 233
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
(905) 415-0800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 233
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 415-0800
Fax: (905) 415-0801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Terry C.C Poon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Poon (CPSO#: 76895 )
Business Address: Suite 233
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
(905) 415-0800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHI CHEONG TERRY POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHI CHEONG TERRY POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Aug 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2001