THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:56:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
Hepatology and Nutrition
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6176
Fax: (416) 813-4972
Address: Toronto General Hospital
Multi-organ transplant program
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G2C4
Phone: 416 813 6169
Fax: 416 813 4972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y Avitzur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Avitzur (CPSO#: 76897 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
Hepatology and Nutrition
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6176
Fax: (416) 813-4972
Address: Toronto General Hospital
Multi-organ transplant program
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G2C4
Phone: 416 813 6169
Fax: 416 813 4972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y Avitzur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Avitzur (CPSO#: 76897 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Jul 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 10 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Yaron Avitzur may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Paediatrics, Division of Gastroenterology/Hepatology and Nutrition,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Avitzur holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Avitzur no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Yaron Avitzur may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Paediatrics, Division of Gastroenterology/Hepatology and Nutrition,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Avitzur holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Avitzur no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2001