THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:07:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Address: 10145 - McVean drive
ErinoakKids Centre for Treatment
and Development
Brampton Ontario L6P4K7
Phone: 905-855-2690
Extension: 2690
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Medical Clinic
475 Charoilois Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0M2
Phone: (905) 454-3347
Fax: (905) 454-3288
Address: 8730 - GORE ROAD
Brampton Ontario L6P 1B0
Phone: 647-557-2232
Fax: 289-720-2047
Address: 3001 HOSPITAL GATE
Georgetown Ontario L6M0L8
Phone: 905-338-4618
Fax: 905-338-4146
Address: Derry Village Clinic
Unit 2-4
7070 St Barbra Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5W 0E6
Phone: (905) 565-9100
Fax: (905) 565-8973
Address: 16-2555 ERIN CENTER BOULEVARD
Mississauga Ontario L5M5H1
Phone: 905-828-0270
Fax: 905-828-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jul 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sohail Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cheema (CPSO#: 76906 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-3655
Business Address: 8730 Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 1B0
(647) 557-2232
Business Address: Peel Medical Clinic
475 Charlois Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0M2
(905) 454-3347
Business Address: 16 - 2555 Erin Center
Mississauga Ontario L5M 5H1
(905) 828-0270
Business Address: Derry Village Clinic
Suite 2-4
7070 St Barbara Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5W 0E6
(905) 565-9100
Business Address: 10145 McVean Dr
Brampton ON L6P 4K7
905-855-2690

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Address: 10145 - McVean drive
ErinoakKids Centre for Treatment
and Development
Brampton Ontario L6P4K7
Phone: 905-855-2690
Extension: 2690
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Medical Clinic
475 Charoilois Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0M2
Phone: (905) 454-3347
Fax: (905) 454-3288
Address: 8730 - GORE ROAD
Brampton Ontario L6P 1B0
Phone: 647-557-2232
Fax: 289-720-2047
Address: 3001 HOSPITAL GATE
Georgetown Ontario L6M0L8
Phone: 905-338-4618
Fax: 905-338-4146
Address: Derry Village Clinic
Unit 2-4
7070 St Barbra Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5W 0E6
Phone: (905) 565-9100
Fax: (905) 565-8973
Address: 16-2555 ERIN CENTER BOULEVARD
Mississauga Ontario L5M5H1
Phone: 905-828-0270
Fax: 905-828-0277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jul 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sohail Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cheema (CPSO#: 76906 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-3655
Business Address: 8730 Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 1B0
(647) 557-2232
Business Address: Peel Medical Clinic
475 Charlois Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0M2
(905) 454-3347
Business Address: 16 - 2555 Erin Center
Mississauga Ontario L5M 5H1
(905) 828-0270
Business Address: Derry Village Clinic
Suite 2-4
7070 St Barbara Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5W 0E6
(905) 565-9100
Business Address: 10145 McVean Dr
Brampton ON L6P 4K7
905-855-2690

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jun 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 23 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sohail Ehsan Cheema may practise medicine independently in paediatrics,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sohail Ehsan Cheema may practise medicine independently in paediatrics,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2001