THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
200 Consillium Place
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 479-8686
Fax: (416) 296-8816

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Read Abughaduma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abughaduma (CPSO#: 76918 )
Business Address: Suite 104
200 Consilium Place
Toronto Ontario M1H 3E4
(416) 479-8686

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 104
200 Consillium Place
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 479-8686
Fax: (416) 296-8816

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Read Abughaduma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abughaduma (CPSO#: 76918 )
Business Address: Suite 104
200 Consilium Place
Toronto Ontario M1H 3E4
(416) 479-8686

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. READ MOHAMED ALI ABUGHADUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUGHADUMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. READ MOHAMED ALI ABUGHADUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUGHADUMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2001