THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pascale Raphy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Raphy (CPSO#: 76920 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000 Extn: 2777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pascale Raphy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Raphy (CPSO#: 76920 )
Business Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000 Extn: 2777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PASCALE RAPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PASCALE RAPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2001