THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:46:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Osmania University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PERSIAN, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Extension: 2826
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New Jersey

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Abedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abedi (CPSO#: 76935 )
Business Address: Department of Pathology
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2701
Business Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
9058954521 Extn: 2826

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PERSIAN, URDU
Medical School: Osmania University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Extension: 2826
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New Jersey

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Abedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abedi (CPSO#: 76935 )
Business Address: Department of Pathology
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2701
Business Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
9058954521 Extn: 2826

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYED TAGHI HASAN ABEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYED TAGHI HASAN ABEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Osmania University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2001