THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:52:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Instituto Tecnologico De Santo Domingo, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Regional Rehabilitation Centre
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Muniz Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Muniz Rodriguez (CPSO#: 76945 )
Business Address: Regional Rehabilitation Centre
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Instituto Tecnologico De Santo Domingo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Regional Rehabilitation Centre
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 07 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Muniz Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Muniz Rodriguez (CPSO#: 76945 )
Business Address: Regional Rehabilitation Centre
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FLOR MARIA MUNIZ RODRIGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNIZ RODRIGUEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FLOR MARIA MUNIZ RODRIGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNIZ RODRIGUEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Instituto Tecnologico De Santo Domingo, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2001