THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:42:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-747-3591
Extension: 32362
Fax: 416-747-3350

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mujeeb Ur Rehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rehman (CPSO#: 76946 )
Business Address: 10-106 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
Etobicoke ON M9V 4E4
416 747 3528
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1N2
(905) 813-2398

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-747-3591
Extension: 32362
Fax: 416-747-3350

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mujeeb Ur Rehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rehman (CPSO#: 76946 )
Business Address: 10-106 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
Etobicoke ON M9V 4E4
416 747 3528
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1N2
(905) 813-2398

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUJEEB UR REHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUJEEB UR REHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 05 Jan 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 05 Jan 2022
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2001