THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:53:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PRHC
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 8765147
Fax: (705) 8765178
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Beaubien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Beaubien (CPSO#: 76947 )
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 377-7735
Business Address: 815 High Street East
Peterborough Ontario K9J 8J9
(705) 876-8737
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5147
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

Corporation Name: Beaubien Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PRHC
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 8765147
Fax: (705) 8765178
Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Beaubien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Beaubien (CPSO#: 76947 )
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 377-7735
Business Address: 815 High Street East
Peterborough Ontario K9J 8J9
(705) 876-8737
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 876-5147
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

Corporation Name: Beaubien Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIOT RENE BEAUBIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUBIEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIOT RENE BEAUBIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUBIEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001