THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:34:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Shores
700 Gordon St
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Care London
Parkwood Institute-Mental Health
PO BOX 5777, STN B
London, ON N6A 4V2
London Ontario N6A4V2
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Extension: 47326
Fax: (519) 455-7151

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Burhan (CPSO#: 76957 )
Business Address: 111 Holmcrest Trail
Toronto Ontario M1C 1V8
5192813636

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Shores
700 Gordon St
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Care London
Parkwood Institute-Mental Health
PO BOX 5777, STN B
London, ON N6A 4V2
London Ontario N6A4V2
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Extension: 47326
Fax: (519) 455-7151

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Burhan (CPSO#: 76957 )
Business Address: 111 Holmcrest Trail
Toronto Ontario M1C 1V8
5192813636

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMER MOHAMMED ABDUL-LATIF BURHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMER MOHAMMED ABDUL-LATIF BURHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2001