THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West
Suite 212
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 907 2003
Fax: 416 907 4166
Address: 4a-2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
Phone: 905-459-4385
Fax: 905-459-6373
Address: 716 The Queensway South
Georgina Ontario L4P 4C9
Phone: (905) 476-0308
Fax: (855) 314-4866
Address: 1250 Castlemore Avenue
Markham Ontario L6E 0H7
Phone: 905-554-9400
Fax: 905-554-9401
Address: 8302 McLeod Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 3K1
Phone: 905-353-0707
Fax: 905-844-2721
Address: 479 Dundas W
Oakville Ontario L6M1L9
Phone: (905)-257-5779
Fax: (905)-257-5789
Address: 145 Morningside Avenue
Unit 19-20
Toronto Ontario M1E 3C7
Phone: 647-983-9293
Fax: 1-888-890-9293

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 13 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Aug 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Almaini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al Maini (CPSO#: 76979 )
Business Address: 89 Queensway West
212
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
416-907-2003

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Queensway West
Suite 212
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 907 2003
Fax: 416 907 4166
Address: 4a-2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
Phone: 905-459-4385
Fax: 905-459-6373
Address: 716 The Queensway South
Georgina Ontario L4P 4C9
Phone: (905) 476-0308
Fax: (855) 314-4866
Address: 1250 Castlemore Avenue
Markham Ontario L6E 0H7
Phone: 905-554-9400
Fax: 905-554-9401
Address: 8302 McLeod Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2H 3K1
Phone: 905-353-0707
Fax: 905-844-2721
Address: 479 Dundas W
Oakville Ontario L6M1L9
Phone: (905)-257-5779
Fax: (905)-257-5789
Address: 145 Morningside Avenue
Unit 19-20
Toronto Ontario M1E 3C7
Phone: 647-983-9293
Fax: 1-888-890-9293

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 13 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Aug 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Almaini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al Maini (CPSO#: 76979 )
Business Address: 89 Queensway West
212
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
416-907-2003

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUSTAFA HABIB ABDULLAH AL MAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL MAINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUSTAFA HABIB ABDULLAH AL MAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL MAINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2001