THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:33:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chesley Medical Clinic
39-2nd Street S.E.
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 363-3220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Aug 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 03 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yoel Moyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Moyal (CPSO#: 77002 )
Business Address: SBGH Chesley Hospital
39 2nd Street South East
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
(519) 363-2340

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chesley Medical Clinic
39-2nd Street S.E.
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 363-3220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Aug 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 03 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yoel Moyal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Moyal (CPSO#: 77002 )
Business Address: SBGH Chesley Hospital
39 2nd Street South East
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
(519) 363-2340

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOEL MOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOEL MOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2001