THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:51:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 772 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 343-477 0163
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.J. Du Bois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Du Bois (CPSO#: 77027 )
Business Address: Frontenac Medical Associates
Suite 201
791 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1E9
(613) 544-2727

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 772 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 343-477 0163
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.J. Du Bois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Du Bois (CPSO#: 77027 )
Business Address: Frontenac Medical Associates
Suite 201
791 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1E9
(613) 544-2727

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISABETH JANE DU BOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DU BOIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELISABETH JANE DU BOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DU BOIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2001