THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baskirian State Medical University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 Victoria St West
Unit 2
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-8800
Fax: (705) 434-4772
Address: 18 King st
Angus Ontario L0M1B2
Phone: (705)424-5551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 238 Barrie St
LOL2NO
Thornton ON L0L 2N0
Phone: 705-291-2500
Fax: 705-434-4772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kogan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Kogan (CPSO#: 77039 )
Business Address: 106 Victoria Street West
Suite 2
Tecumseh Ontario L9R 1Y7
(705) 435-8800
Business Address: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Tecumseh Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: 18 King Street
Angus Ontario L0M 1B2
(705) 424-5551
Business Address: 238 Barrie St
Thornton ON L0L 2N0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Baskirian State Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 Victoria St West
Unit 2
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-8800
Fax: (705) 434-4772
Address: 18 King st
Angus Ontario L0M1B2
Phone: (705)424-5551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 238 Barrie St
LOL2NO
Thornton ON L0L 2N0
Phone: 705-291-2500
Fax: 705-434-4772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kogan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Kogan (CPSO#: 77039 )
Business Address: 106 Victoria Street West
Suite 2
Tecumseh Ontario L9R 1Y7
(705) 435-8800
Business Address: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Tecumseh Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: 18 King Street
Angus Ontario L0M 1B2
(705) 424-5551
Business Address: 238 Barrie St
Thornton ON L0L 2N0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IZABELLA KOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IZABELLA KOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baskirian State Medical University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2001