THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:45:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6M 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052861134
Fax: 9052861135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AlShabanah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al Shabanah (CPSO#: 77045 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
4162421000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6M 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052861134
Fax: 9052861135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AlShabanah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al Shabanah (CPSO#: 77045 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
4162421000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASAN ABDULAZIZ H AL SHABANAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SHABANAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASAN ABDULAZIZ H AL SHABANAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SHABANAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2001