THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 08:56:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Dr. Fortin/Dr. Kettle Office
1493 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B7
Phone: 705-673-5035
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sudbury Dental Group
36 Elgin Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5B4
Phone: 705-673-5615
Fax: 705-673-3877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kirk J. Duguay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Duguay (CPSO#: 77059 )
Business Address: 1493 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B7
(705) 673-5035
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 36 Elgin Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5B4
(705) 673-5615

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Dr. Fortin/Dr. Kettle Office
1493 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B7
Phone: 705-673-5035
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sudbury Dental Group
36 Elgin Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5B4
Phone: 705-673-5615
Fax: 705-673-3877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kirk J. Duguay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Duguay (CPSO#: 77059 )
Business Address: 1493 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B7
(705) 673-5035
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 36 Elgin Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5B4
(705) 673-5615

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRK JOHN DUGUAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGUAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRK JOHN DUGUAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGUAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Oct 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2001