THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:37:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7580
Extension: 3465
Fax: (905) 848-7676
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga, ON
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Marlee Avenue
North York Diagnostic and Cardiac Center
Toronto Ontario M6B 3H7
Phone: 4167830000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: #102 - 2640 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Diagnostics & Cardiac Clinic
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4N9
Phone: 9054173001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Myrosia Foga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Foga (CPSO#: 77083 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
(905) 848-7580 Extn: 3465
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7580 Extn: 3465

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7580
Extension: 3465
Fax: (905) 848-7676
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga, ON
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Marlee Avenue
North York Diagnostic and Cardiac Center
Toronto Ontario M6B 3H7
Phone: 4167830000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: #102 - 2640 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Diagnostics & Cardiac Clinic
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4N9
Phone: 9054173001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Myrosia Foga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Foga (CPSO#: 77083 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
(905) 848-7580 Extn: 3465
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7580 Extn: 3465

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYROSIA MARIA FOGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOGA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYROSIA MARIA FOGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOGA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2001