THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:04:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
2nd Floor, CPCR L2119
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 78571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan Street, North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District Memorial Hosp.
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Blair Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Macdonald (CPSO#: 77099 )
Business Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(616) 737-8899 Extn: 7812
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
CPCR 2121
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 78212
Business Address: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 7812
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
2nd Floor, CPCR L2119
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 78571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan Street, North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District Memorial Hosp.
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Blair Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Macdonald (CPSO#: 77099 )
Business Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(616) 737-8899 Extn: 7812
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
CPCR 2121
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 78212
Business Address: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 7812
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BLAIR MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BLAIR MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2001