THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
520 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 576-4910
Fax: (519) 576-3836

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodney Bruce Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bruce (CPSO#: 77112 )
Business Address: Suite 102
520 University Avenue
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
(519) 576-4910

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
520 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 576-4910
Fax: (519) 576-3836

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodney Bruce Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bruce (CPSO#: 77112 )
Business Address: Suite 102
520 University Avenue
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
(519) 576-4910

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RODNEY ROBERT BRUCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUCE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RODNEY ROBERT BRUCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUCE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2001