THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:30:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4054
Fax: (613) 761-4476

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smyth and Condon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4054
Fax: (613) 761-4476

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smyth and Condon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARL RICHARD SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARL RICHARD SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2001