THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2573 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 721-8643
Address: 150 Robertson Road, Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Malan Oosthuizen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oosthuizen (CPSO#: 77166 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2573 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 7B3
(613) 721-8630

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2573 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 721-8643
Address: 150 Robertson Road, Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Malan Oosthuizen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oosthuizen (CPSO#: 77166 )
Business Address: Appletree Medical Centre
2573 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 7B3
(613) 721-8630

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN MALAN OOSTHUIZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OOSTHUIZEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN MALAN OOSTHUIZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OOSTHUIZEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Dec 2016
Summary:
Effective August 13, 2019, Dr. Oosthuizen has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Dec 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Dec 2016
Summary:
Effective August 13, 2019, Dr. Oosthuizen has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Dec 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2001