THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:39:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Josephson (CPSO#: 77169 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
RFE-GS-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856
Business Address: 9300 Airport Road
Suite 520
Mount Hope Ontario L0R 1W0
(289) 426-1133

Corporation Name: Issley Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jun 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Josephson (CPSO#: 77169 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
RFE-GS-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3856
Business Address: 9300 Airport Road
Suite 520
Mount Hope Ontario L0R 1W0
(289) 426-1133

Corporation Name: Issley Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Jun 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY BLAIR JOSEPHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPHSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY BLAIR JOSEPHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPHSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Feb 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2001