THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:46:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Natal, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-7207
Fax: (519) 258-7208
Address: Windsor Regional hospital Ouellette
1030 Ouellette
Windsor Ontario N9G 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathaven Moodley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moodley (CPSO#: 77184 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 130
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 258-7207

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Natal, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-7207
Fax: (519) 258-7208
Address: Windsor Regional hospital Ouellette
1030 Ouellette
Windsor Ontario N9G 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathaven Moodley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moodley (CPSO#: 77184 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411
Business Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 130
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 258-7207

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHAVEN MOODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHAVEN MOODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOODLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Sep 2016
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Sep 2016
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Natal, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2001