THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:25:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 4-44
125 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 823-1730
Fax: (519) 823-9639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 24 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shende Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Shende (CPSO#: 77185 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: University of Pune, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 4-44
125 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 823-1730
Fax: (519) 823-9639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 24 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 May 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shende Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Shende (CPSO#: 77185 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VASANTI NITIN SHENDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VASANTI NITIN SHENDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2001