THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:37:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
Queen's University/Kingston General
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 766-0635
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 69 Union St W
Kingston ON K7L 2N9
Phone: (613) 533-3506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael McDonnell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McDonnell (CPSO#: 77215 )
Business Address: 8 Kensington Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7L 4B5
6132177107

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael McDonnell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
Queen's University/Kingston General
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 766-0635
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 69 Union St W
Kingston ON K7L 2N9
Phone: (613) 533-3506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael McDonnell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McDonnell (CPSO#: 77215 )
Business Address: 8 Kensington Avenue
Kingston Ontario K7L 4B5
6132177107

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael McDonnell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BOURKE MCDONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONNELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BOURKE MCDONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONNELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2001
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2001