THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:28:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bahia, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesiology
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 271-2120
Extension: 2510
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mota (CPSO#: 77221 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: University of Bahia, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesiology
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 271-2120
Extension: 2510
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mota (CPSO#: 77221 )
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 272-8210

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Apr 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 08 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jorge Antonio Rocha Mota may practise medicine independently in
Anaesthesiology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jorge Antonio Rocha Mota may practise medicine independently in
Anaesthesiology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bahia, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Mar 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2001
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2002

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2001