THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:27:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
1450 Hwy 2 E
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4956
Fax: (905) 721-6176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Feb 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gergely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gergely (CPSO#: 77226 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
1450 Hwy 2 E
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4956
Fax: (905) 721-6176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Feb 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gergely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gergely (CPSO#: 77226 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA ESZTER GERGELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERGELY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA ESZTER GERGELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERGELY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2002