THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:15:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vellore Medical Walk-in &
Cosmetic Clinic
Suite 104
3737 Major Mackenzie Drive
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 417-7771
Fax: (905) 417-1377
Address: 3737 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 0A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Khan (CPSO#: 77248 )
Business Address: Suite 104
3737 Major Mackenzie Drive
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0A2
(905) 417-7771

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vellore Medical Walk-in &
Cosmetic Clinic
Suite 104
3737 Major Mackenzie Drive
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 417-7771
Fax: (905) 417-1377
Address: 3737 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 0A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Khan (CPSO#: 77248 )
Business Address: Suite 104
3737 Major Mackenzie Drive
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0A2
(905) 417-7771

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
06 Dec 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 06 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., December 6, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Ehsan Ullah Khan:

a. Dr. Khan shall be prohibited from performing liposuction unless and
until such time as he is approved by the College in accordance with
the College's Changing Scope of Practice Policy #1-08, as may be
amended from time to time, and any other applicable regulations,
guidelines or policies as may exist at the time he seeks approval;

b. Notwithstanding paragraph (a), Dr. Khan may surgically assist in
liposuction procedures on the following terms:

1. at a facility approved by the College in accordance with
Ontario Regulation 114/94 made under the Medicine Act, 1991
("O/Reg. 114/94");

2. with a College approved Royal College certified surgeon who
is performing liposuction and who is in attendance for the
duration of the liposuction procedure performed; and

3. Dr. Khan shall not be the most responsible physician for any
patients;

c. Dr. Khan shall keep a log containing the names and dates of birth
of all patients for whom he surgically assists and the name of the
College approved surgeon for whom Dr. Khan is assisting. Dr. Khan
shall send this log to the College at the end of each month that he
acts as a surgical assistant for one or more liposuction
procedures;

d. In any facility owned or operated by Dr. Khan, Dr. Khan shall be
prohibited from engaging in any invasive cosmetic surgical
procedures as defined in O/Reg. 114/94, as may be amended from time
to time, including hair transplants;

e. Dr. Khan shall not interfere with unannounced inspections by the
College for the purpose of determining his compliance with this
Order.







VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., December 6, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Ehsan Ullah Khan:

a. Dr. Khan shall be prohibited from performing liposuction unless and
until such time as he is approved by the College in accordance with
the College's Changing Scope of Practice Policy #1-08, as may be
amended from time to time, and any other applicable regulations,
guidelines or policies as may exist at the time he seeks approval;

b. Notwithstanding paragraph (a), Dr. Khan may surgically assist in
liposuction procedures on the following terms:

1. at a facility approved by the College in accordance with
Ontario Regulation 114/94 made under the Medicine Act, 1991
("O/Reg. 114/94");

2. with a College approved Royal College certified surgeon who
is performing liposuction and who is in attendance for the
duration of the liposuction procedure performed; and

3. Dr. Khan shall not be the most responsible physician for any
patients;

c. Dr. Khan shall keep a log containing the names and dates of birth
of all patients for whom he surgically assists and the name of the
College approved surgeon for whom Dr. Khan is assisting. Dr. Khan
shall send this log to the College at the end of each month that he
acts as a surgical assistant for one or more liposuction
procedures;

d. In any facility owned or operated by Dr. Khan, Dr. Khan shall be
prohibited from engaging in any invasive cosmetic surgical
procedures as defined in O/Reg. 114/94, as may be amended from time
to time, including hair transplants;

e. Dr. Khan shall not interfere with unannounced inspections by the
College for the purpose of determining his compliance with this
Order.







Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Dec 2010
Summary of Decision:
On December 6, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Khan has committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

Deficiencies were identified in Dr. Khan's liposuction practice pertaining to engaging in liposuction in an unsafe facility, failing to monitor patients before and after liposuction procedures and in charting deficiently. Dr. Khan failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession between 2006 and 2008 in his care of five liposuction patients in each of these areas.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Khan attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Khan's
certificate of registration:

a. Dr. Khan shall be prohibited from performing liposuction unless and until such time as he is approved by the College in accordance with the College's Changing Scope of Practice Policy #1-08, as may be amended from time to time, and any other applicable regulations, guidelines or policies as may exist at the time he seeks approval;

b. Notwithstanding paragraph 2(a), Dr. Khan may surgically assist in liposuction procedures on the following terms:

i. at a facility approved by the College in accordance with Ontario Regulation 114/94 made under the Medicine Act, 1991 ("O/Reg. 114/94");

ii. with a College approved Royal College certified surgeon who is performing liposuction and who is in attendance for the duration of the liposuction procedure performed; and

iii. Dr. Khan shall not be the most responsible physician for any patients;

c. Dr. Khan shall keep a log containing the names and dates of birth of all patients for whom he surgically assists and the name of the College approved surgeon for whom Dr. Khan is assisting. Dr. Khan shall send this log to the College at the end of each month that he acts as a surgical assistant for one or more liposuction procedures;

d. In any facility owned or operated by Dr. Khan, Dr. Khan shall be prohibited from engaging in any invasive cosmetic surgical procedures as defined in O/Reg. 114/94, as may be amended from time to time, including hair transplants;

e. Dr. Khan shall not interfere with unannounced inspections by the College for the purpose of determining his compliance with this Order.
3. Dr. Khan shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $3,650.00.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 6-8, December 13-14, 2010

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Dec 2010
Summary of Decision:
On December 6, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Khan has committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

Deficiencies were identified in Dr. Khan's liposuction practice pertaining to engaging in liposuction in an unsafe facility, failing to monitor patients before and after liposuction procedures and in charting deficiently. Dr. Khan failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession between 2006 and 2008 in his care of five liposuction patients in each of these areas.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Khan attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Khan's
certificate of registration:

a. Dr. Khan shall be prohibited from performing liposuction unless and until such time as he is approved by the College in accordance with the College's Changing Scope of Practice Policy #1-08, as may be amended from time to time, and any other applicable regulations, guidelines or policies as may exist at the time he seeks approval;

b. Notwithstanding paragraph 2(a), Dr. Khan may surgically assist in liposuction procedures on the following terms:

i. at a facility approved by the College in accordance with Ontario Regulation 114/94 made under the Medicine Act, 1991 ("O/Reg. 114/94");

ii. with a College approved Royal College certified surgeon who is performing liposuction and who is in attendance for the duration of the liposuction procedure performed; and

iii. Dr. Khan shall not be the most responsible physician for any patients;

c. Dr. Khan shall keep a log containing the names and dates of birth of all patients for whom he surgically assists and the name of the College approved surgeon for whom Dr. Khan is assisting. Dr. Khan shall send this log to the College at the end of each month that he acts as a surgical assistant for one or more liposuction procedures;

d. In any facility owned or operated by Dr. Khan, Dr. Khan shall be prohibited from engaging in any invasive cosmetic surgical procedures as defined in O/Reg. 114/94, as may be amended from time to time, including hair transplants;

e. Dr. Khan shall not interfere with unannounced inspections by the College for the purpose of determining his compliance with this Order.
3. Dr. Khan shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $3,650.00.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 6-8, December 13-14, 2010

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2002