THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:31:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Madras, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1939 Kennedy Rd
102
Scarborough ON M1P 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 754 0003
Fax: 416 754 0005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manoharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Manoharan (CPSO#: 77259 )
Business Address: E3, E6 - 6065 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1X 0A8
(416) 754-0003

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Madras, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1939 Kennedy Rd
102
Scarborough ON M1P 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 754 0003
Fax: 416 754 0005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manoharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Manoharan (CPSO#: 77259 )
Business Address: E3, E6 - 6065 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1X 0A8
(416) 754-0003

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATHIYAPOOMA MANOHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOHARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATHIYAPOOMA MANOHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOHARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Madras, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2002