THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: (905) 451-8272
Address: 223 Main Street South
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6H1
Phone: 905-460-0080
Fax: 905-454-2957
Address: 287 Dundas street east
Hamilton on L0R 2H6
Phone: 905-690-0505
Fax: 905-

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basil Shilash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shilash (CPSO#: 77270 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: 200 - 60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: (905) 451-8272
Address: 223 Main Street South
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6H1
Phone: 905-460-0080
Fax: 905-454-2957
Address: 287 Dundas street east
Hamilton on L0R 2H6
Phone: 905-690-0505
Fax: 905-

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basil Shilash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shilash (CPSO#: 77270 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: 200 - 60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASIL MUHSON ALWAN SHILASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHILASH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASIL MUHSON ALWAN SHILASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHILASH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Apr 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2002