THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B4R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 709 4274
Fax: 905 709 4985
Address: Suite 1022
6021 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M 3W2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6021 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M 3W2
Phone: 9057094274
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wong and Pang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong (CPSO#: 77292 ) Dr. W. Pang (CPSO#: 78739 )
Business Address: A202 - 3000 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 6E1
(905) 480-1050
Business Address: Suite 1022
6021 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M 3W2
Business Address: 310 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 4R2
(905) 709-4274

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B4R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 709 4274
Fax: 905 709 4985
Address: Suite 1022
6021 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M 3W2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6021 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M 3W2
Phone: 9057094274
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wong and Pang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong (CPSO#: 77292 ) Dr. W. Pang (CPSO#: 78739 )
Business Address: A202 - 3000 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 6E1
(905) 480-1050
Business Address: Suite 1022
6021 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2M 3W2
Business Address: 310 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 4R2
(905) 709-4274

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL CHOI YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL CHOI YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2002